HI SCR170 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Establish A Working Group To Evaluate Options That Provide Additional Air Service To Remote And Underserved Communities Across The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Establish A Working Group To Evaluate Options That Provide Additional Air Service To Remote And Underserved Communities Across The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 855). |
2023-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-24 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2256), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-19 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2173), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-04-13 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-13-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545). |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-23. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR128 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.