HI SCR177 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Purchase Agricultural Land From Dole Food Company, Inc.
Title
Dole Food Company Inc.; Purchase; Agricultural Land
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from AGL/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=177&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR177_.HTM |