HI SCR186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of The Mayor, County Of Hawaii To Study The Feasibility Of Creating An Oversight Authority For Subdivisions In The County Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Office Of The Mayor, County Of Hawaii To Study The Feasibility Of Creating An Oversight Authority For Subdivisions In The County Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 830). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-18. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-24-18. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-18-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 796). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-18-18. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 615). |
2018-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-16 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2051-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-04-11 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3393) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC/TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR169 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.