HI SCR203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR203
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Develop Programs To Recapture, Retain, And Share The Cultural And Environmental Knowledge Of Limu Kala.
Title
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Develop Programs To Recapture, Retain, And Share The Cultural And Environmental Knowledge Of Limu Kala.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 781). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2058-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3670) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR203 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR168 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR196 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR168 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR196 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.