HI SCR234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Attorney General To Investigate Whether Transient Accommodations And General Excise Taxes On The Internet Sale Of Transient Accommodations Are Being Assessed, Collected, And Remitted To The State And To Take Appropriate Legal Action, As Necessary.
Title
TAT: Internet Sales; Non-Collection; Semi Investigation/Legal Action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3102) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Hooser. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |