HI SCR37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish The Agriculture 2030 Investment Program And A Farm To Plate Program In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish The Agriculture 2030 Investment Program And A Farm To Plate Program In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-27-18 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3044), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-18 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR37 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.