HI SCR40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Renaming Of And The Extension Of The Prompt Payment Task Force To Develop Recommendations To Address Issues That Affect Procurement For Goods And Services Purchased Through Nonprofit Organizations, Including Human Service Nonprofit Organizations That Deliver Pivotal Goods And Services To Individuals, Families, Communities, And Other Small Businesses.
Title
Prompt Payment Task Force; Extended to June 30, 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-05-08 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 847). | |
2012-05-08 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 846). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Espero, Ige, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 804). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Deferred until 04-25-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 658). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1798-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Lee, Choy, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Cullen, Giugni, Ward. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 695) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3393) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Reported from EDT/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2835), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM will hold a public decision making on 03-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM deferred the measure until 03-07-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/PGM, WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) Offered. |