HI SCR43 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-21-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-21-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Designate, When Appropriate, Route 200 On The Island Of Hawaii As The Daniel K. Inouye Legacy Highway.
Title
Daniel K. Inouye Legacy Highway; Route 200; Saddle Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-21-13. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). |
2013-03-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2013-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=43&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR43_.HTM |