HI SCR49 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Continue To Collaborate With Family And Community Organizations To Establish, Implement, And Monitor Statewide Policies For Family-school Partnerships In Hawaii's Public Schools.
Title
Education; Family-School Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=49&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR49_.HTM |