HI SCR50 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-16-19 9:00AM in conference room 430.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming The Natural Energy Laboratory Of Hawaii Authority As The George R. Ariyoshi Natural Energy Lab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renaming The Natural Energy Laboratory Of Hawaii Authority As The George R. Ariyoshi Natural Energy Lab.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-16-19 9:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-04-12HouseProposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 04-16-19 9:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-04-12HouseRe-referred to TIA, referral sheet 51
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1705) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-08SenateReferred to EET.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback