HI SCR52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR52
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission And The County Of Hawaii To Collaborate To Identify Sea Level Rise At Kahaluu Bay And Jointly Pursue A Master Plan To Relocate The Pavilion At Kahaluu Bay, Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission And The County Of Hawaii To Collaborate To Identify Sea Level Rise At Kahaluu Bay And Jointly Pursue A Master Plan To Relocate The Pavilion At Kahaluu Bay, Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR52 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR34 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR34 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.