HI SCR6 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Dedication Of Kukuia Street, Lahaina, Hawaii, To The County Of Maui.
Title
Approving The Dedication Of Kukuia Street, Lahaina, Hawaii, To The County Of Maui.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 793). |
2024-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7). |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1936-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-18 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-24 10:45AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2024-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 4-3-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3364), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR8 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to HOU, WAM.