HI SCR62 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR62
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Auditor, In Conjunction With The State Procurement Office, If Necessary, To Conduct A Financial And Management Audit Of The Tax System Modernization Project, With A Focus On The Project's Contracts.
Title
Requesting The State Auditor, In Conjunction With The State Procurement Office, If Necessary, To Conduct A Financial And Management Audit Of The Tax System Modernization Project, With A Focus On The Project's Contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3449) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR62 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to IAA/GVO.