HI SCR65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Aerospace As A Strategic And Timely Growth Industry For Hawaii And Requesting The State Administration To Take Proactive, Coordinated, And Sustained Action To Fully Realize The Significant Scientific, Educational, And Commercial Benefits The Aerospace Industry Can Bring To The State.
Title
Aerospace Development; State Administration; Office of Aerospace Development; Strategic Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2925), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=65&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR65_.HTM |