HI SCR71 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating April 28, 2016, As "workers' Memorial Day" In Hawaii In Memory Of Workers Killed, Injured, Or Disabled In The Workplace.
Title
Workers' Memorial Day; Workplace Injuries and Fatalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2016-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tokioka, Ward. |
2016-04-20 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-22-16 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5). |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-04-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 04-15-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 436) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-16 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |