HI SCR85 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR85
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System's Vice President For Budget And Finance To Develop A Plan To Redevelop The Lower Campus Of The University Of Hawaii At Manoa Through A Public Private Partnership.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System's Vice President For Budget And Finance To Develop A Plan To Redevelop The Lower Campus Of The University Of Hawaii At Manoa Through A Public Private Partnership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3507) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3301), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR85 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).