HI SR107 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-Referred to GVO/JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-Referred to GVO/JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting State And County Agencies To Notify Animal Welfare Organizations Of Deceased Cats And Dogs That Are Picked Up Along State And County Roadways.
Title
Requesting State And County Agencies To Notify Animal Welfare Organizations Of Deceased Cats And Dogs That Are Picked Up Along State And County Roadways.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/JDC. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR150 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR125 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - Re-Referred to GVO/JDC.
SCR125 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - Re-Referred to GVO/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=107&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SR107_.HTM |