HI SR120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Office Of Internal Audit To Conduct An Audit Of Various Programs At The University Of Hawaii West Oahu That Receive Extramural Funding, Including Title Iii Grant Funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Office Of Internal Audit To Conduct An Audit Of Various Programs At The University Of Hawaii West Oahu That Receive Extramural Funding, Including Title Iii Grant Funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-22SenateOne Day Notice 04-23-19.
2019-04-22SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2221) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Taniguchi.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-19 10:50AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-04-04SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback