HI SR130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Assist The Friends Of Liliuokalani Gardens In Its Preparations To Commemorate The Centennial Of The Death Of Queen Liliuokalani And The Establishment Of The Garden She Fostered.
Title
Liliuokalani Gardens; Centennial Celebration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported from THA/WTL/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Tokuda. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/WTL/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to THA/WTL/TEC. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=130&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR130_.HTM |