HI SR133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission, In Collaboration With The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs' Division Of Consumer Advocacy, To Convene A Working Group To Create A Hawaii Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program To Assist Low-income Households With Paying For Their Home Energy.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission, In Collaboration With The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs' Division Of Consumer Advocacy, To Convene A Working Group To Create A Hawaii Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program To Assist Low-income Households With Paying For Their Home Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3698) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR133 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR44 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR242 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR44 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR242 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.