HI SR147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Propose Legislation That Establishes Incentives For Firm Renewable Electricity Generation.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Propose Legislation That Establishes Incentives For Firm Renewable Electricity Generation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3565) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR175 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 22
SCR171 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 28
SCR171 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 28