HI SR151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Report On The Cultural And Therapeutic Services Provided By Community-based Organizations At The Kawailoa Youth And Family Wellness Center.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Report On The Cultural And Therapeutic Services Provided By Community-based Organizations At The Kawailoa Youth And Family Wellness Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-24. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3400) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR180 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR175 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
SCR175 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Subjects
Community-Based Organizations
Department of Health and Human Services
Homeless Youth
Incarcerated Youth
Kawailoa Youth and Family Wellness
Mental Health
Report
Department of Health and Human Services
Homeless Youth
Incarcerated Youth
Kawailoa Youth and Family Wellness
Mental Health
Report