HI SR179 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development And County Of Maui To Inventory And Map Existing R-1 Water Delivery Systems And Reservoirs In Maui County.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development And County Of Maui To Inventory And Map Existing R-1 Water Delivery Systems And Reservoirs In Maui County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3459) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR203 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).