HI SR192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Collaborate With Federal, State, And County Governments; Landowners; And Stakeholders To Protect, Restore, And Manage The West Maui Wetlands And Wetlands Statewide.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Collaborate With Federal, State, And County Governments; Landowners; And Stakeholders To Protect, Restore, And Manage The West Maui Wetlands And Wetlands Statewide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3471) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR194 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR215 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
SCR215 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).