HI SR26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH/HMS.
2019-03-05SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback