HI SR27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Report To The Legislature On Its Progress Regarding The Resolution Of Conflicts Under The Prohibition On Commercial Activity Under The 1965 Surfrider-royal Hawaiian Sector Beach Agreement.
Title
DLNR; 1965 SurfRider-Royal Hawaiian Sector Beach Agreement; Prohibition on Commercial Activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-16. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from WLA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3257) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to WLA/EET. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |