HI SR35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Honolulu Police Department To Report On How Much Funding Is Required For On-campus School Resource Officers.
Title
Requesting The Honolulu Police Department To Report On How Much Funding Is Required For On-campus School Resource Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3243), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:46PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR35 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=35&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR35_.HTM |