HI SR35 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Hawaii's Coral Reefs As Critical Natural Infrastructure And Strongly Supporting Nature-based Solutions Such As Coral Reef Restoration For Risk Reduction.
Title
Designating Hawaii's Coral Reefs As Critical Natural Infrastructure And Strongly Supporting Nature-based Solutions Such As Coral Reef Restoration For Risk Reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-23 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR85 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR41 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
SCR41 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.