HI SR53 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR53
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Develop A Master Plan For The Hilo International Aerospace And Technology Park.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Develop A Master Plan For The Hilo International Aerospace And Technology Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR53 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR94 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
HR94 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=53&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR53_.HTM |