HI SR54 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR54
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Redistrict Students Who Will Be Living In The Koa Ridge Development To The Pearl City-waipahu Complex Area.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education To Redistrict Students Who Will Be Living In The Koa Ridge Development To The Pearl City-waipahu Complex Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3713) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3246), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR54 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=54&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR54_.HTM |