HI SR69 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Improve The State Of Hawaii's Open Data Portal By Increasing And Expanding The Data Sets Available On The Open Data Portal, Centralizing All Open Data Sets Of All State Departments Onto The Open Data Portal, And Continually Updating The Data Sets For Accuracy And Recency Of Publicly Accessible Data.
Title
Urging The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Improve The State Of Hawaii's Open Data Portal By Increasing And Expanding The Data Sets Available On The Open Data Portal, Centralizing All Open Data Sets Of All State Departments Onto The Open Data Portal, And Continually Updating The Data Sets For Accuracy And Recency Of Publicly Accessible Data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3454) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to LBT. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR83 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Subjects
Centralization
Chief Data Officer
Chief Information Officer
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Open Data Portal
Public Access
State Departments
Chief Data Officer
Chief Information Officer
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Open Data Portal
Public Access
State Departments