HI SR74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR74
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requests The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Identify Barriers And Solutions To Expanded Water Reuse In The State.
Title
Requests The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Identify Barriers And Solutions To Expanded Water Reuse In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3454) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3320), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 2:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR74 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.