HI SR9 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Recommitted to HOU/HHS.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Recommitted to HOU/HHS.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority To Utilize The State's Rental Supplement Program To Provide Homeowners Insurance Premium Assistance To Housing Owners Who Rent Or Lease To Qualified Kupuna A Mortgage Property Within Designated Lava Zones.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority To Utilize The State's Rental Supplement Program To Provide Homeowners Insurance Premium Assistance To Housing Owners Who Rent Or Lease To Qualified Kupuna A Mortgage Property Within Designated Lava Zones.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted to HOU/HHS. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-27-24. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3351) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 1:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HHS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR17 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - Recommitted to HOU/HHS.
Subjects
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Homeowners Insurance Premium Assistance
Kupuna Housing
Lava Zones
State Rent Supplement Program for Kupuna
Homeowners Insurance Premium Assistance
Kupuna Housing
Lava Zones
State Rent Supplement Program for Kupuna