HI SR96 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Full Voting Rights For Residents Of The District Of Columbia.
Title
United States Congress; Full Voting Rights for Residents of the District of Columbia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=96&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR96_.HTM |