IA HF167 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering in movable locations.(See HF 2195.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering in movable locations.(See HF 2195.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ras Smith [D] | Rep. Timi Brown-powers [D] | Sen. Molly Donahue [D] | Rep. Art Staed [D] |
Rep. Bob Kressig [D] | Rep. Jeff Shipley [R] | Rep. Charlie McConkey [D] | Rep. Brian Meyer [D] |
Rep. Dave Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 416. |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 167. |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Mitchell, Bacon and Konfrst. H.J. 79. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Nielsen and Thompson. H.J. 289. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 183. |
Same As/Similar To
SF128 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Schultz. S.J. 727.
HF2195 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
HF2195 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF167 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF167.html |