IA HF172 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to program flexibilities under the special supplemental nutrition program for women, infants, and children program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to program flexibilities under the special supplemental nutrition program for women, infants, and children program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2023 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Moore, T. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 242. |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 216. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF172 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF172.html |