IA HF212 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the vacation of certain termination of parental rights orders.(See HF 554.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the vacation of certain termination of parental rights orders.(See HF 554.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 554. |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 396. |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 12:00PM RM 15. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Jacobsen and Wolfe. H.J. 223. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
HF554 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF212 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF212.html |