IA HF2174 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Subcommittee, Sodders, Courtney, and Garrett. S.J. 495.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Subcommittee, Sodders, Courtney, and Garrett. S.J. 495.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to strip searches at a county jail or municipal holding facility. (Formerly HSB 510)
Title
A bill for an act relating to strip searches at a county jail or municipal holding facility. (Formerly HSB 510)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Sodders, Courtney, and Garrett. S.J. 495. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 490. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 490. |
2014-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 436. |
2014-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 467. |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 5. H.J. 423. |
2014-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8021 adopted. H.J. 423. |
2014-02-24 | House | Amendment H-8021 filed. H.J. 311. |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 182. |