IA HF2277 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct of a brewer with regard to wholesaler agreements. (Formerly HSB 540.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct of a brewer with regard to wholesaler agreements. (Formerly HSB 540.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 926. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 385. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 386. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 383. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2299. S.J. 382. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2299. S.J. 369. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 369. |
2024-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 360. |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 345. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 181. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB540 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2277.
SSB3076 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
SF2299 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 383.
SSB3076 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
SF2299 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 383.