IA HF2279 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public utilities, including energy production, public utility affiliates, and cable and video service. (Formerly HSB 555.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public utilities, including energy production, public utility affiliates, and cable and video service. (Formerly HSB 555.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 906. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 942. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 942. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5223 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 942. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2300. S.J. 941. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2300. S.J. 909. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 909. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays 5. H.J. 883. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendments H-8011 and H-8176 adopted. H.J. 882. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8176 filed. H.J. 555. |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment H-8011 filed. H.J. 287. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 182. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB555 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2279.
SSB3075 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2300.
SF2300 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 942.
SSB3075 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2300.
SF2300 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 942.