IA HF2354 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of elections and voter registration by modifying the close of registration prior to a primary election, requiring that absentee ballots be received before the polls close on election day, and allowing for changes to the envelopes provided to absentee voters. (Formerly HSB 630)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of elections and voter registration by modifying the close of registration prior to a primary election, requiring that absentee ballots be received before the polls close on election day, and allowing for changes to the envelopes provided to absentee voters. (Formerly HSB 630)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 498. |
2014-03-13 | House | Amendment H-8121 filed. H.J. 497. |
2014-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-02-25 | House | Amendment H-8036 filed. H.J. 339. |
2014-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 300. |