IA HF2371 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 763.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 763.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a mass notification and emergency messaging system fund. (Formerly HSB 595) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2465)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a mass notification and emergency messaging system fund. (Formerly HSB 595) (See Cmte. Bill HF 2465)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 763. |
2014-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee, Worthan, Gustafson, and Jacoby. H.J. 352. |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 304. |