IA HF2392 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Message from Senate. H.J. 934.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Message from Senate. H.J. 934.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to legalize and validate the proceedings preliminary to and in connection with a special election held to authorize the imposition of a local option sales and services tax within the City of Adel, Iowa under Iowa Code Chapter 423B, declaring the validity of said proceedings and the legality of the local option sales and services tax authorized by the special election, and providing an effective date and for retroactive applicability. (Formerly HSB 657)
Title
A bill for an act to legalize and validate the proceedings preliminary to and in connection with a special election held to authorize the imposition of a local option sales and services tax within the City of Adel, Iowa under Iowa Code Chapter 423B, declaring the validity of said proceedings and the legality of the local option sales and services tax authorized by the special election, and providing an effective date and for retroactive applicability. (Formerly HSB 657)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Message from Senate. H.J. 934. | |
2012-05-08 | Immediate message. S.J. 910. | |
2012-05-08 | Failed to pass Senate, ayes 22, nays 24. S.J. 908. | |
2012-05-08 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 907. | |
2012-05-07 | Subcommittee, Jochum, Black, and Feenstra. S.J. 901. | |
2012-04-25 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 860. | |
2012-04-25 | Message from House. S.J. 860. | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 889. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed House, ayes 63, nays 31. H.J. 882. | |
2012-04-25 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 882. | |
2012-02-28 | Proof of publication certified. S.J. 400. | |
2012-02-28 | Proof of publication certified. H.J. 375. | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 345. |