IA HF240 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act removing psilocybin and psilocyn from the list of substances classified as schedule I controlled substances under Iowa's uniform controlled substances Act.
Title
A bill for an act removing psilocybin and psilocyn from the list of substances classified as schedule I controlled substances under Iowa's uniform controlled substances Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 12:15PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Shipley, Olson and Wheeler. H.J. 307. |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 267. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF240 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF240.html |