IA HF2430 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for an Iowa individual income tax checkoff for the reduction of food insecurity within this state and making an appropriation. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2471)
Title
A bill for an act providing for an Iowa individual income tax checkoff for the reduction of food insecurity within this state and making an appropriation. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2471)
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Pettengill [R] | Rep. Kirsten Running-Marquardt [D] | Rep. Bobby Kaufmann [R] | Rep. Daniel Kelley [D] |
Rep. Art Staed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 782. |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-24 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Kelley, and Sands. H.J. 566. |
2014-03-12 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 377. |