IA HF2442 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 882.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 882.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2006.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act providing for brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2006.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 882. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 837. |
2018-04-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 784. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 927. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0. S.J. 924. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5235. S.J. 923. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5235. S.J. 903. |
2018-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 767. |
2018-04-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 788. |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 2. H.J. 765. |
2018-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8363, as amended. H.J. 764. |
2018-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8375, to Senate amendment H-8363 filed, adopted. H.J. 764. |
2018-04-04 | House | Senate amendment H-8363 filed. H.J. 750. |
2018-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 736. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 867. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 865. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5217 filed, adopted. S.J. 865. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 688. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bowman, and Chelgren. S.J. 634. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 597. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 597. |
2018-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 512. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays 1. H.J. 508. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8186 adopted, as amended. H.J. 507. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8205 to H-8186 filed, adopted. H.J. 507. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8186 filed. H.J. 489. |
2018-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 335. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2006 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 512.