IA HF2445 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the privacy of a victim of a sex offense in a criminal or civil proceeding. (Formerly HF 2054.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the privacy of a victim of a sex offense in a criminal or civil proceeding. (Formerly HF 2054.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 610. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 639. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 637. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2092. S.J. 637. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2092. S.J. 501. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 501. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 442. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 440. |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2005 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2092. S.J. 164.
HF2054 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2092 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.
HF2054 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2092 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.