IA HF252 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the comprehensive transition and postsecondary program scholarship program. (Formerly HF 16.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the comprehensive transition and postsecondary program scholarship program. (Formerly HF 16.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/08/2023 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Giddens, and Rozenboom. S.J. 425. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 416. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 378. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 378. |
2023-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 407. |
2023-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 391. |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment H-1022 adopted. H.J. 390. |
2023-02-21 | House | Amendment H-1022 filed. H.J. 386. |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 282. |
Same As/Similar To
HF16 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 407.