IA HF2636 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 928.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 928.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2121, HSB 535.) Effective date: 04/19/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2121, HSB 535.) Effective date: 04/19/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 928. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 760. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 773. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 772. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2397. S.J. 772. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2397. S.J. 593. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 593. |
2024-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 623. |
2024-03-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 633. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 619. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-02-29 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 431. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3002 (Related) 2024-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397.
HSB535 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2121.
HF2121 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF2397 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.
HSB535 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2121.
HF2121 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF2397 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.