IA HF2641 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Message from Senate. H.J. 830.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Message from Senate. H.J. 830.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to agriculture, by providing for the administration of programs and regulations, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2510, HSB 560.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2024, 12/31/2024
Title
A bill for an act relating to agriculture, by providing for the administration of programs and regulations, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2510, HSB 560.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2024, 12/31/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8306 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8306 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8305 be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8306 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8306 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8305 be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 830. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 864. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 863. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2410. S.J. 863. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2410. S.J. 804. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 804. |
2024-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 771. |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 765. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8280 adopted. H.J. 765. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8305, yeas 35, nays 62, filed, lost. H.J. 764. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8306, yeas 35, nays 62, filed, lost. H.J. 763. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendments H-8232 and H-8233 out of order. H.J. 763. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8295 adopted. H.J. 763. |
2024-04-09 | House | Amendment H-8295 filed. H.J. 759. |
2024-04-08 | House | Amendment H-8280 filed. H.J. 747. |
2024-03-20 | House | Amendments H-8232 and H-8233 filed. H.J. 633. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-03-11 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 533. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3052 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2209.
HSB560 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2510.
SF2209 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2410. S.J. 510.
HF2510 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
SF2410 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 864.
HSB560 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2510.
SF2209 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2410. S.J. 510.
HF2510 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
SF2410 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 864.